House | 06/06/2013 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. | ||
House | 06/02/2013 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |