House | 05/28/2013 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |