House | 06/05/2013 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/02/2013 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2013 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Read by title, amended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |