Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR22 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 13RS-663	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2013
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 22
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT: Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for FY
2013-2014
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2013-2014, as adopted2
by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection3
and Restoration Authority.4
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and5
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the6
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion7
Board; and8
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been9
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects10
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for11
inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan, and make recommendations to the Atchafalaya Basin12
Research and Promotion Board; and13
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan is14
essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and15
WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2011,16
through June 30, 2012, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated17
the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for18
inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and19
WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was then presented for public comment and20
discussion at meetings that were held on November 13, 2012, in Morgan City, Louisiana,21 HLS 13RS-663	ENGROSSED
HCR NO. 22
Page 2 of 3
on November 14, 2012, in St. Martinville, Louisiana, and on November 15, 2012, in1
Plaquemine, Louisiana; and2
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public3
meeting held on November 29, 2012, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and4
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin5
Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Annual Basin Plan; and6
WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was submitted on January 22, 2013, to the7
Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for8
their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal protection and9
restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA at that meeting;10
and11
WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on February 6, 2013, the Atchafalaya Basin12
Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and13
unanimously approved the proposed Annual Basin Plan; and14
WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual15
Basin Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Annual Basin Plan by16
resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and17
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan shall not be effective or18
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to19
disapprove the annual plan; and20
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan21
if the legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.22
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby23
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2013-2014, as presented24
by the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya25
Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.26
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the27
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and28
Promotion Board.29 HLS 13RS-663	ENGROSSED
HCR NO. 22
Page 3 of 3
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
St. Germain	HCR No. 22
Approves the FY 2013-2014 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan.