Louisiana 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR22 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            ENROLLED
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 22
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2013-2014, as adopted
by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection
and Restoration Authority.
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
Board; and
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for
inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan, and make recommendations to the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board; and
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan is
essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and
WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2011,
through June 30, 2012, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated
the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for
inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and
WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was then presented for public comment and
discussion at meetings that were held on November 13, 2012, in Morgan City, Louisiana,
on November 14, 2012, in St. Martinville, Louisiana, and on November 15, 2012, in
Plaquemine, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public
meeting held on November 29, 2012, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and ENROLLEDHCR NO. 22
Page 2 of 2
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin
Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Annual Basin Plan; and
WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was submitted on January 22, 2013, to the
Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for
their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal protection and
restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA at that meeting;
and
WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on February 6, 2013, the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and
unanimously approved the proposed Annual Basin Plan; and
WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual
Basin Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Annual Basin Plan by
resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan shall not be effective or
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to
disapprove the annual plan; and
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan
if the legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2013-2014, as presented
by the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya
Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and
Promotion Board.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE