Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 61, nays 23. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported favorably (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported favorably (5-3-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|