House
|
05/28/2013
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|