House
|
06/06/2013
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 65, nays 25, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/6/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 31. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Reconsidered, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 46. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported favorably (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|