Senate | 05/16/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 75, nays 8. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Prefiled. |