House | 05/16/2013 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 5/15/2013. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Approved on 5/15/2013. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/6/2013. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Request study by the committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/3/2013. | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Sent to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Study request list distributed to members on 4/29/2013. | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Received on 4/8/2013. |