House | 06/06/2013 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 79, nays 8. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/02/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. | ||
House | 06/02/2013 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/29/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2013. | ||
House | 05/29/2013 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |