LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR7
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR7
Action History
House
06/06/2013
Approved on 6/6/2013.
House
06/04/2013
Study request list distributed to members on 6/4/2013.
House
05/29/2013
Received on 5/29/2013.