Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Effective date 6/10/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 216.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 29. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 21, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|