Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date 6/17/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 353.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 25. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|