Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor. (See Journal Addendum Page 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on June 2, 2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Lopinto, Abramson, and Leger.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Nevers, and Murray.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported with amendments (9-1-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|