Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective date 6/14/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 292.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 21, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|