Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date 1/1/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 358.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Stuart Bishop, Simon, and Anders.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Heitmeier, and Buffington.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|