House | 05/14/2013 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |