Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Effective date 6/30/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 208.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 26. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported favorably (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
By a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|