Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB218 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RDCSB218 2073 3103
Page 1 of 2
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Sharon F. Lyles.
DIGEST
Morrell (SB 218)
Present law requires the DOTD to collect tolls to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge
(CCC) beginning on January 1, 2013, until December 31, 2033, subject to a favorable vote
of certain electors. On November 6, 2012, electors approved renewal of tolls.  On March 5,
2013, Hon. William Morvant, Judge, 19
th
 JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, vacated the
election results which approved renewal of tolls on the CCC and ordered a new election to
be held on May 4, 2013.  DOTD suspended toll collections on March 5, 2013.
Proposed law prohibits DOTD from enforcing present law to collect a toll, charge,
administrative fee, or late charge required from any person for failure to pay a toll to cross
the CCC from January 1, 2013, through May 4, 2013.
Proposed law requires DOTD to conduct a toll violation amnesty program for all persons
alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge prior to
January 1, 2013.
Proposed law requires DOTD to begin the toll violation amnesty program no later than
August 1, 2013 and to conclude the program on October 1, 2013 and to publicize the
program.
Proposed law provides that DOTD shall not take any action to collect a charge or
administrative fee from who is alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City
Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.
Proposed law provides that persons who have entered into payment plans with DOTD in
connection with an alleged failure to pay a toll to collect the Crescent City Connection
Bridge may avail themselves of the toll amnesty violation program.
Proposed law provides that DOTD shall retain twenty percent of the funds collected during
the toll amnesty violation program to pay for the costs incurred by the department to
implement the program.
Proposed law provides that upon conclusion of the program that DOTD shall notify DPS&C,
office of motor vehicles, of all person who disposed of toll violations pursuant to the toll
violation amenity program and that the office of motor vehicles shall be prohibited from
refusing to renew the driver's licenses of such person for the alleged failure to respond to a
notice from DOTD pertaining to the alleged failure to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City
Connection Bridge.
Proposed law requires DOTD to turn over all evidence of outstanding toll violations alleged
to have occurred prior to January 1, 2013, to the Department of Justice or Department of
Revenue for collections upon conclusion of the program.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 48:1161.2(D); Adds R.S. 47:7013.1)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Transportation, Highways
and Public Works to the engrossed bill. RDCSB218 2073 3103
Page 2 of 2
1. Added a provision which requires DOTD to conduct a toll violation amnesty
program for all persons alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent
City Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.
2. Added a provision which requires DOTD to begin the toll violation amnesty
program no later than August 1, 2013 and to conclude the program on October
1, 2013 and to publicize the program.
3. Added a provision that restricts DOTD from taking any action to collect a charge
or administrative fee from who is alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the
Crescent City Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.
4. Added a provision that specifies that persons who have entered into payment
plans with DOTD in connection with an alleged failure to pay a toll to collect the
Crescent City Connection Bridge may avail themselves of the toll amnesty
violation program.
5. Added a provision that requires DOTD retain twenty percent of the funds
collected during the toll amnesty violation program to pay for the costs incurred
by the department to implement the program.
6. Added a provision that specifies that upon conclusion of the program that DOTD
shall notify DPS&C, office of motor vehicles, of all person who disposed of toll
violations pursuant to the toll violation amnesty program and that the office of
motor vehicles shall be prohibited from refusing to renew the driver's licenses of
such person for the alleged failure to respond to a notice from DOTD pertaining
to the alleged failure to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge.
7. Added a provision that requires DOTD to turn over all evidence of outstanding
toll violations alleged to have occurred prior to January 1, 2013, to the
Department of Justice or Department of Revenue for collections upon conclusion
of the program.