Louisiana 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB218 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version

                            Page 1 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2013	ENROLLED
SENATE BILL NO. 218
BY SENATOR MORRELL AND REPRESENTATI VE GIROD JACKSON 
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 48:1161.2(D) and to enact R.S. 47:7013.1, relative to collection2
of tolls and fees; prohibits the Department of Transportation and Development from3
acting to collect tolls and certain fees and charges from any person who failed to pay4
a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge during a certain time period; to5
require the Department of Transportation and Development to establish a toll6
violation amnesty program for certain persons who failed to pay a toll to cross the7
Crescent City Connection Bridge; to provide for terms and conditions of a toll8
amnesty program; to provide for the costs to implement a toll amnesty program; to9
require the Department of Transportation and Development to turn certain debt over10
to the Department of Justice or Department of Revenue for collections; and to11
provide for related matters.12
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:13
Section 1.  R.S. 47:7013.1 is hereby enacted to read as follows:14
§7013.1. Collection of tolls, fees, and charges on Crescent City Connection15
Bridge; prohibition; amnesty program16
A. Notwithstanding the provisions of R.S. 47:7012 and 7013, or any17
other law to the contrary, the Department of Transportation and Development18
shall not take any action to collect a toll, charge, administrative fee, or late19
charge from any person who failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City20
Connection Bridge, beginning on January 1, 2013, and continuing through21
March 5, 2013.22
B. Notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, as of August23
1, 2013, notices of violations or delinquencies shall not be required to be sent to24
any person alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City25
ACT No. 274 SB NO. 218	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.1
C. (1) The department shall establish a toll violation amnesty program2
for all persons alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City3
Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.4
(2)(a) The department shall begin conducting the program no later than5
August 1, 2013, and shall conclude the program on October 1, 2013.6
(b) The department shall publicize the program in order to maximize the7
public awareness of and participation in the program.8
(3) During the program, the department shall not take any action to9
collect a charge, administrative fee, or late charge from a person who is alleged10
to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge prior11
to January 1, 2013.12
(4)(a) Any person who has entered into a payment plan agreement in13
connection with an alleged failure to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City14
Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013, shall be entitled to avail themselves15
of the program.16
(b) Persons who avail themselves of the program shall be relieved of any17
further obligations pursuant to any payment plan agreement, and be obligated18
only to pay amounts due under the program.19
(c) The department may develop and implement procedures for applying20
payments made under payment plan agreements as credits against any amounts21
due under the program.22
(5) The department shall deposit all funds collected during the amnesty23
program into the Crescent City Transition Fund.24
(6) Upon conclusion of the program, the department shall do the25
following:26
(a) Notify the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, office of27
motor vehicles, of all persons who disposed of toll violations pursuant to the28
program.  The office of motor vehicles shall be prohibited from refusing to29
renew the driver's licenses of any such persons for the alleged failure to respond30 SB NO. 218	ENROLLED
Page 3 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
to a notice from the department pertaining to the alleged failure to pay a toll to1
cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge.2
(b)  Submit all evidence of outstanding toll violations alleged to have3
occurred prior to January 1, 2013, to the Department of Justice or the4
Department of Revenue for collection.5
Section 2.  R.S. 48:1161.2(D) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:6
§1161.2.  Crescent City Transition Fund7
*          *          *8
D. Monies in the fund shall be subject to appropriation by the legislature9
upon recommendation of the secretary of the Department of Transportation and10
Development. If the Department of Transportation and Development determines that11
an appropriation is necessary, the appropriated as follows: 12
(a) The first four million dollars of monies deposited in the fund shall be13
appropriated for use by the Department of Transportation and Development,14
hereinafter referred to as the "department", for the purpose of capitalizing ferry15
service formerly operated by the Crescent City Connection Division in the Marine16
Trust Program.  One million four hundred thousand dollars of such funds17
available for such ferry service shall be appropriated and available for ferry18
operation costs, such funds to be appropriated annually in the amount of seven19
hundred thousand dollars for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2013, and July20
1, 2014.21
(b) An amount not to exceed twenty percent of the funds collected and22
deposited into the fund pursuant to the toll violation amnesty program required23
to be established pursuant to R.S. 47:7013.1(B) shall be appropriated to the24
department for its costs incurred to implement the program.25
(c) Whether or not tolls are extended on the Crescent City Connection26
Bridge, the The balance of the monies in the fund as of December 31, 2012, shall be27
appropriated to the New Orleans Regional Planning Commission for lighting of the28
eastbank and westbank approaches to the Crescent City Connection Bridge including29
General DeGaulle and the Westbank Expressway approach through ground level,30 SB NO. 218	ENROLLED
Page 4 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
improvements to ingress and egress points, lighting, maintenance, grass cutting, and1
landscaping of the westbank expressway Westbank Expressway and connecting2
arteries.3
*          *          *4
Section 3. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not5
signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature6
by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If7
vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become8
effective on the day following such approval.9
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED: