Louisiana 2013 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB218 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Morrell (SB 218)	Act No. 274
Prior law required the DOTD to collect tolls to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge
(CCC) beginning on January 1, 2013, until December 31, 2033, subject to a favorable vote
of certain electors. On November 6, 2012, electors approved renewal of tolls.  On March 5,
2013, 19
th
 JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, vacated the election results which approved
renewal of tolls on the CCC and ordered a new election to be held on May 4, 2013. DOTD
suspended toll collections on March 5, 2013.
New law prohibits DOTD from enforcing prior law to collect a toll, charge, administrative
fee, or late charge required from any person for failure to pay a toll to cross the CCC from
January 1, 2013, through March 5, 2013.
New law requires DOTD to conduct a toll violation amnesty program for all persons alleged
to have failed to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge prior to January 1,
2013.
New law requires DOTD to begin the toll violation amnesty program no later than August
1, 2013, to conclude the program on October 1, 2013, and to publicize the program.
New law provides that DOTD shall not take any action to collect a charge, administrative
fee, or late charge from a person who is alleged to have failed to pay a toll to cross the
Crescent City Connection Bridge prior to January 1, 2013.
New law provides that persons who have entered into payment plans with DOTD in
connection with an alleged failure to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City Connection Bridge
prior to January 1, 2013, may avail themselves of the toll violation amnesty program and that
persons who avail themselves of the program shall be relieved of any further obligations
under any payment plan and be obligated only to pay amounts due under the program.
New law provides that DOTD shall deposit the funds collected during the toll violation
amnesty program into the Crescent City Transition Fund.
New law provides that upon conclusion of the program that DOTD shall notify DPS&C,
office of motor vehicles, of all persons who disposed of toll violations pursuant to the toll
violation amnesty program and that the office of motor vehicles shall be prohibited from
refusing to renew the driver's licenses of such person for the alleged failure to respond to a
notice from DOTD pertaining to the alleged failure to pay a toll to cross the Crescent City
Connection Bridge.
New law requires DOTD upon conclusion of the program to turn over all evidence of
outstanding toll violations alleged to have occurred prior to January 1, 2013, to the
Department of Justice or Department of Revenue for collections.
Prior law provided for deposit of monies in the Crescent City Transition Fund and that the
first $4 million deposited into the Fund be appropriated to DOTD for capitalizing ferry
service formerly operated by the Crescent City Connection Division in the Marine Trust
Program and that the balance in the fund as of December 31, 2012, be appropriated to the
New Orleans Regional Planning Commission for lighting of the approaches to the Crescent
City Connection.
New law requires that of the amount appropriated for ferry service formerly operated by the
Crescent City Connection in prior law that $1,400,000 of such funds shall be available for
ferry operation costs, such funds to be appropriated annually in the amount of $700,000 for
the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2013, and July 1, 2014. 
New law removes the reference to the December 31, 2012, date.
New law also provides that an amount not to exceed 20% of the monies collected under the
toll violation amnesty program and deposited in the Fund as provided in new law be
appropriated to DOTD for its costs to implement the program. 
Effective upon signature of the governor (June 13, 2013). (Amends R.S. 48:1161.2(D); adds R.S. 47:7013.1)