Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
House
05/08/2013
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
Senate
05/07/2013
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Senate
05/06/2013
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
05/01/2013
Reported with amendments.
Senate
04/16/2013
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.