Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Effective date 7/1/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 230.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|