Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Effective date 6/10/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 219.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|