Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date 6/17/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Carter, and Robideaux.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Appel, and Heitmeier.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|