House
|
06/06/2013
|
By a vote of 56 yeas, 30 nays, not having received a two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
By a vote of 62 yeas, 29 nays, not having received a two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 33. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably (15-2) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|