Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Effective date 8/1/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|