Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Effective date 8/1/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 373.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 31. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Reported favorably (9-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|