LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB74
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB74
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB74
Action History
Senate
05/06/2013
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 8 yeas and 27 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Senate
04/30/2013
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
04/29/2013
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
Senate
04/08/2013
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Senate
03/26/2013
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.