House | 06/05/2013 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. | ||
House | 06/02/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |