Senate | 06/06/2013 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2013 | Reported favorably (16-0). | ||
House | 05/28/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/23/2013 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |