Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|