House | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Received from the House with amendments. | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 1 nays. | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013. | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |