Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 89 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|