Senate | 05/22/2013 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |