Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported with amendments (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|