Senate | 05/07/2013 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Approved on 5/1/2013. | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Study request list distributed to members on 4/29/2013. | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Received on 4/24/2013. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/17/2013. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/16/2013. |