SLS 13RS-1920 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2013 SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 100 BY SENATOR NEVERS COMMENDATIONS. To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring Washington Parish Sheriff's Office deputies killed in the line of duty. A RESOLUTION1 To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring the seven Washington Parish Sheriff's2 Office deputies who made the ultimate sacrifice of giving their lives in the line of3 duty.4 WHEREAS, Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal has designated Wednesday, May5 15, 2013, as "Fallen Heroes Memorial Day" to honor the seven Washington Parish Sheriff's6 Office deputies who have been killed in the line of duty since 1899; and7 WHEREAS, on April 7, 1899, Sheriff Henry S. Burkhalter, at the age of 45, married8 with six children, was killed while in pursuit of murder suspects; and9 WHEREAS, on March 3, 1923, Deputy Sheriff Wiley Pierce, age 42, husband and10 father of six, and Deputy Sheriff Robert Wesley, age 35, husband and father of four, were11 killed while attempting to arrest two men for making moonshine; and12 WHEREAS, on July 21, 1934, Deputy Sheriff Delos C. Wood, age 61, married, was13 killed while attempting to arrest a suspect; and14 WHEREAS, on June 2, 1965, Deputy Sheriff Oneal Moore, age 34, husband, father15 of four daughters and the first African American deputy to serve in Washington Parish, was16 shot and killed by an unknown assailant in another vehicle who also seriously injured his17 partner, Deputy Creed Rogers; and18 SR NO. 100 SLS 13RS-1920 ORIGINAL Page 2 of 2 WHEREAS, on September 20, 2005, Deputy Sheriff Jeffery Bickham, age 43,1 married with two daughters, was killed when pinned between his patrol car and another2 vehicle; and3 WHEREAS, on December 6, 2006, Deputy Sheriff Yvonne Pettit, mother of five4 children, was shot and killed; and 5 WHEREAS, all gave their lives while serving in the line of duty as law enforcement6 officers sworn to protect public safety and uphold the law; and 7 WHEREAS, their ultimate sacrifice for their community should be duly recognized8 and remembered; and 9 WHEREAS, the Scriptures remind us that "Greater love hath no man than this, that10 he lay down his life for his friends".11 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana12 does hereby commend the Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs of the Washington Parish Sheriff's13 Office for their continued devotion and service to the people of Washington Parish, and does14 hereby recognize Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as Fallen Heroes Memorial Day.15 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to16 Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal, and to each of the families of the deputy sheriffs who17 gave their lives in the service of Washington Parish.18 The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Julie J. Baxter. DIGEST Nevers SR No. 100 Recognizes Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring seven Washington Parish Sheriff's Office deputies who, from 1899 through the present day, have made the ultimate sacrifice of giving their lives in the line of duty.