Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2013 ENROLLED SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 100 BY SENATOR NEVERS A RESOLUTION To recognize Fallen Heroes Memorial Day honoring the seven Washington Parish Sheriff's Office deputies who made the ultimate sacrifice of giving their lives in the line of duty. WHEREAS, Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal has designated Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as "Fallen Heroes Memorial Day" to honor the seven Washington Parish Sheriff's Office deputies who have been killed in the line of duty since 1899; and WHEREAS, on April 7, 1899, Sheriff Henry S. Burkhalter, at the age of 45, married with six children, was killed while in pursuit of murder suspects; and WHEREAS, on March 3, 1923, Deputy Sheriff Wiley Pierce, age 42, husband and father of six, and Deputy Sheriff Robert Wesley, age 35, husband and father of four, were killed while attempting to arrest two men for making moonshine; and WHEREAS, on July 21, 1934, Deputy Sheriff Delos C. Wood, age 61, married, was killed while attempting to arrest a suspect; and WHEREAS, on June 2, 1965, Deputy Sheriff Oneal Moore, age 34, husband, father of four daughters and the first African American deputy to serve in Washington Parish, was shot and killed by an unknown assailant in another vehicle who also seriously injured his partner, Deputy Creed Rogers; and WHEREAS, on September 20, 2005, Deputy Sheriff Jeffery Bickham, age 43, married with two daughters, was killed when pinned between his patrol car and another vehicle; and WHEREAS, on December 6, 2006, Deputy Sheriff Yvonne Pettit, mother of five children, was shot and killed; and WHEREAS, all gave their lives while serving in the line of duty as law enforcement officers sworn to protect public safety and uphold the law; and WHEREAS, their ultimate sacrifice for their community should be duly recognized and remembered; and SR NO. 100 ENROLLED Page 2 of 2 WHEREAS, the Scriptures remind us that "Greater love hath no man than this, that he lay down his life for his friends". THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend the Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs of the Washington Parish Sheriff's Office for their continued devotion and service to the people of Washington Parish, and does hereby recognize Wednesday, May 15, 2013, as Fallen Heroes Memorial Day. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Washington Parish Sheriff Randy Seal, and to each of the families of the deputy sheriffs who gave their lives in the service of Washington Parish. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE