Louisiana 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR151 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2013	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 151
BY SENATOR MURRAY 
A RESOLUTION
To express support for the Nagorno Karabakh Republic's efforts to develop as a free and
independent nation.
WHEREAS, Nagorno Karabakh, also known as Artsakh, has historically been
Armenian territory, populated by an overwhelming majority of Armenians, which was
illegally severed from Armenia by the Soviet Union in 1921 and placed under the newly
created Soviet Azerbaijani administration; and
WHEREAS, February 20, 1988, marked the beginning of the national liberation
movement in Nagorno Karabakh, which inspired people throughout the Soviet Union to
stand up against tyranny and for their rights and freedoms, helping to bring democracy to
millions and contributing to world peace; and
WHEREAS, the United States Congress has repeatedly expressed support for the
legitimate freedom aspirations of the people of Nagorno Karabakh; and
WHEREAS, on September 2, 1991, the legislature of Nagorno Karabakh declared
formation of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic, in accordance with then acting legislation;
and
WHEREAS, on December 10, 1991, the people of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic
voted in favor of the independence, and on January 6, 1992, the democratically elected
legislature of the Republic formally declared independence; and
WHEREAS, since proclaiming independence, the Nagorno Karabakh Republic has
registered significant progress in democracy building, which has been most recently
demonstrated during the July 19, 2012, presidential elections that were assessed by
international observers as free and transparent. SR NO. 151	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 2
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
hereby encourages and supports the Nagorno Karabakh Republic's continuing efforts to
develop as a free and independent nation in order to guarantee its citizens those rights
inherent in a free and independent society.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the president and Congress of the United States
of America are hereby urged to support the self-determination and democratic independence
of the Nagorno Karabakh Republic and its constructive involvement with the international
community's efforts to reach a just and lasting solution to security issues in that strategically
important region.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
president of the United States, the secretary of the United States Senate, the clerk of the
United States House of Representatives, and to each member of the Louisiana delegation to
the United States Congress.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE