Senate | 05/13/2013 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |