Senate | 05/22/2013 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |