LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR66
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR66
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR66
Action History
Senate
05/22/2013
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Senate
05/15/2013
Read by title and adopted.
Senate
05/14/2013
Reported favorably.
Senate
04/30/2013
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Senate
04/29/2013
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.