Senate | 04/22/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2014. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2014. | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported with amendments (9-1-1). | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Read by title. |