Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read by title. Indefinitely postponed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2014 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Reported favorably (10-6). | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Read by title. |