Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Montoucet, Dove, and Stuart Bishop.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, Walsworth, and Broome.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Read by title.
|
|
|