Senate | 04/24/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014. | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Read by title. |