Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Reported with amendments (10-6). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Read by title.
|
|
|