Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
By a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Reported favorably (5-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title.
|
|
|